Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - Penalties
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Military)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a summary court-martial to impose a sentence of confinement for a period not to exceed 30 days without regard to rank.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
9/29/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {543521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 9/29/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed 20
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Special Order until 2/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 22
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Conway) Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {543521/1 Adopted 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26
House 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 28
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM