Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Military

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 /CH0047
Title
Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - Penalties
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0062
Title
State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0107 /CH0047 Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - Penalties By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0062 State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment Protection By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page