Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - Required
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified applicants and licensees of the Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists, the Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators, the Board of Occupational Therapy Practice, and the Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners to submit to a specified criminal history records check; authorizing specified health occupations boards to take specified actions against applicants and licensees who fail to submit the specified criminal history records check; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
10/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484031/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/21/2015 10/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/21/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {484031/1 Report Adopted 20
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 22
House 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 24
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-302, 10-302.1, 10-304, 10-308, 10-311, 10-315, 16-302, 16-302.1, 16-303, 16-305, 16-311, 2-302, 2-302.1, 2-302.2, 2-302.3, 2-303, 2-303.1, 2-306, 2-308, 2-314, 9-301, 9-302, 9-302.1, 9-303, 9-308, 9-311, 9-312.1, 9-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM