Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil Enforcement
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the distribution of a tobacco product, an electronic smoking device, cigarette rolling papers, or a coupon redeemable for a tobacco product to a minor, with specified exceptions; authorizing a county health officer or specified designees of a county health officer to issue a citation for a violation of the Act; establishing specified civil penalties for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2016
Legislative Date
10/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2016 10/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2016 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page