Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period during which the Office of Legislative Audits and the Legislative Auditor are required to audit specified State funds, programs, authorities, units, and a specified local liquor board; requiring the audit of each unit of State government to be conducted at an interval ranging from 3 to 4 years unless the Legislative Auditor determines, on a per case basis, that more frequent audits are required; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0084
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/14/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Appropriations 23
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-505 )
(   11-101, 11-313, 4.5-203, 4.5-703 )
(   10-201, 10-227, 10-401, 10-414, 10-501, 10-526, 10-806, 10-825, 10-901, 10-911 )
(   16-315 )
(   9-1605, 9-1605.1 )
(   13-1303, 13-2206, 19-201, 19-216 )
(   11-101, 11-408 )
(   30-102, 30-106 )
(   1-309, 2-514 )
(   2-701, 2-702, 3A-506 )
(   2-1220, 9-101, 9-121, 9-1A-34, 9-1A-35 )
(   5-101, 5-215.1, 6-101, 6-212.1, 7-101, 7-211.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM