Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Prohibition of Polygraph Examinations by Employers - Exemption
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Public Safety and Correctional Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the prohibition against an employer requiring or demanding, as a condition of employment, that an individual submit to or take a polygraph examination or other similar test an individual who applies for employment or is employed as a correctional officer of a State correctional facility and an individual who applies for employment with or is employed by a State correctional facility in any capacity that involves direct contact with an inmate in a State correctional facility; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0173
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/06/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {852915/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/06/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {227479/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 First Reading Judiciary 40
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {852915/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 62
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Passed Enrolled 59
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM