Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Submission of a Comprehensive Master Plan - Repeal of Duplicative Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a duplicative requirement for the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to submit a comprehensive master plan to the State Board of Education.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0163
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2016
Legislative Date
1/15/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2016
Legislative Date
2/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2016 1/15/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2016 1/15/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 14
Senate 2/01/2016 2/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 14
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 17
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM