Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County - County Treasurer - Abolishment and Transfer of Functions to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Abolishing the elected position of County Treasurer of Somerset County; transferring the duties and functions of the office of County Treasurer to the County Supervisor of Tax Collection, who shall work under the direction of the County Finance Director; repealing provisions related to the appointment and salary of the deputy treasurer of Somerset County; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {209239/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {860911/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {209239/1 Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 27
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {860911/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-101 through 7-103, 7-102, 7-104 through 7-107, 7-108, 7-109, 7-110, 7-111, 7-112, 7-113, 7-114 through 7-118, 7-202 through 7-205, 7-302, 9-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM