Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Personal Injury or Death Caused by Dog - Rebuttable Presumption
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Brochin, Gladden, Raskin, Stone, and Manno
Status
In the House - Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that, in an action against an owner of a dog for damages for personal injury or death caused by the dog, evidence that the dog caused the injury or death creates a rebuttable presumption that the owner knew or should have known that the dog had vicious or dangerous propensities; providing that the presumption may not be rebutted as a matter of law; providing that the presumption may be rebutted by specified clear and convincing evidence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0078
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798879/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798879/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {333623/1 Rejected (6-40)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {922917/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Senators Raskin, Zirkin, and Shank
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Delegates Dumais, Clippinger, and Cluster
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {798879/1 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {798879/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {333623/1 Rejected (6-40) 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable with Amendments {922917/1 Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Senators Raskin, Zirkin, and Shank 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 House Refuses to Recede 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Delegates Dumais, Clippinger, and Cluster 62
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Barve) Adopted 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM