Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Middleton, Benson, Conway, Ferguson, Frosh, Jones-Rodwell, King, Manno, McFadden, and Montgomery
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending to March 15, 2015, a specified reporting requirement of a registered debt settlement services provider; extending the deadline for specified reporting requirements of the Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation and the Consumer Protection Division in the Office of the Attorney General; extending to June 30, 2016, the termination date for the Maryland Debt Settlement Services Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0704
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/14/2014 1/14/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 13
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 13
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 15
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 17
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM