Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion Amount
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Feldman, Klausmeier, Simonaire, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a requirement that the Maryland estate tax shall be in effect even if the federal estate tax is not in effect on the date of the decedent's death; repealing a requirement that the Maryland estate tax be determined without regard to a specified deduction allowed under the federal estate tax; and applying the Act to decedents dying after December 31, 2013.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM