Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Benson, Mathias, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a life insurer to refuse an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor only under certain circumstances; requiring an application for a policy of life insurance on the life of a minor to include a certain consent and certain signatures; requiring a life insurer to take certain actions as part of certain standards and procedures for policy application and acceptance for policies of life insurance on the life of a minor; applying the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0027
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237578/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {237578/1 Adopted 28
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Text - Third - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text - Chapter - Life Insurance - Life of a Minor - Underwriting Standards and Procedures
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-119 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM