Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Review of Duplicative Academic Program Proposals - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pugh, Benson, Ferguson, McFadden, and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to make a determination regarding unnecessary duplication of programs after receipt of a request for such a determination from Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, or the University of Maryland, Eastern Shore; requiring the Commission to make a determination regarding sound educational justification under specified circumstances; providing that specified determinations of the Commission are subject to judicial review; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2014
Legislative Date
1/14/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554535/1
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554535/1
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {883229/1 Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/11 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
23
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2014 1/14/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {554535/1 17A
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted 17A
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {554535/1 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Conway) Adopted 18
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {883229/1 Rejected (13-32) 19
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Special Order until 2/11 (Senator Conway) Adopted 21
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 23
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-206, 11-206.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM