Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Fiscal Year 2017 Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals and entities that qualified for a rebate in fiscal year 2017 but did not receive it due to a limitation on the total amount of rebates to be issued in fiscal year 2017; limiting the rebate to applicants that applied for a rebate during fiscal year 2017; allowing a credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for certain qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and Electric Vehicle Excise Tax Credit - Fiscal Year 2017 Applicants
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page