Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of Paternity
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Resources)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a laboratory report of a blood or genetic test constitutes a presumptive finding of paternity in specified cases if the test was conducted in a specified laboratory and the report establishes a statistical probability of paternity of at least 99.0%; requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration to serve a specified notice on the alleged father; authorizing the Administration to file a copy of the report with the Division of Vital Records of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {158472/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {158472/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judiciary 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1029.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM