Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting specified errors and omissions in the Annotated Code and in specified uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting specified obsolete references; reorganizing specified sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying specified corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of specified errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 16
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 16
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17A
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 20
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 4:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 32
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Second Reading Passed 32
House 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 35
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Returned Passed 34
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-202, 11-402, 12-107, 5-201, 6-201, 6-301, 6-401, 8-224, 8-603 )
(   2-508 )
(   12-1007, 12-124.1, 12-312, 12-409.1, 12-410, 14-1103, 14-1212.3 )
(   12-302, 2-309, 3-816.1, 5-724, 9-109.1 )
(   13-516, 18-14A-01, 18-1702, 23-607, 23-609, 24-1003, 3-110, 5-301, 7-1504, 7-424, 8-405 )
(   13-227 )
(   1-406, 2-1002, 2-1103, 2-202, 3-401, 4-304, 5-204, 5-602, 6-401, 6-823, 8-501, 9-1605.2, 9-1701 )
(   14-305, 4-506, 5-592 )
(   13-1504, 13-203, 13-2103, 13-506, 15-139, 17-217, 19-143, 19-308.9, 2-104, 7-501 )
(   12-6C-03.2, 14-207, 14-404, 14-5C-18, 14-5E-18, 15-310, 19-202, 19-302, 19-308, 1A-316, 3-5A-09 )
(   5-318.1 )
(   15-111, 15-1212, 15-140, 15-508, 24-213, 27-501, 27-914 )
(   13-108, 16-305 )
(   22-407, 9-802 )
(   10-908, 5-403 )
(   11-116, 5-134 )
(   7-105.9 )
(   10-510, 2-1237, 9-1A-09 )
(   10-208, 10-725, 11-204, 1-303, 2-1104, 2-614 )
(   12-117, 7-208, 9-319 )
(   21-801.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM