Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Workforce Shortage Student Assistance Grants for Child Care Providers - Hattie N. Harrison Memorial Scholarship
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Naming the Workforce Shortage Student Assistance grant for child care providers to be the grant known as the Hattie N. Harrison Memorial Scholarship; and generally relating to the Workforce Shortage Student Assistance grants for child care providers.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {153125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Favorable 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 32
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {153125/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 55
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 57
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-708 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM