Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Maryland Insurance Administration, and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Administration, be subject to a preliminary evaluation in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law); requiring the Administration to submit specified reports to specified committees of the General Assembly and the Department of Legislative Services at specified times; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18
Text - Third - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 23
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text - Chapter - Maryland Insurance Administration - Sunset Review - Required Reports and Repeal of Preliminary Evaluation Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM