Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the Elevator Safety Review Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2029, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that govern the Board be performed on or before a specified date; requiring the Board to study, make recommendations, and report its findings on specified matters on or before October 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0117
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Text - Chapter - Elevator Safety Review Board - Sunset Extension, Program Evaluation, and Reporting Requirement
(   12-842 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page