Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring physicians licensed to practice medicine in the State to notify patients in writing and on each visit of specified information relating to professional liability insurance coverage; requiring the notification to be signed by the patient and retained by the physicians as part of the patient records; requiring the physician to post specified information in a specified location in their place of practice; requiring the State Board of Physicians to develop specified language for the notification; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0882 Session: 2009 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Physicians - Professional Liability Insurance Coverage - Notification and Posting Requirements
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM