Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Elections - Early Voting Centers - Days of Operation
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Gladden, and McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the days on which each early voting center is required to be open before a primary or general election.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0263
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM