Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified licensed real estate salespersons and licensed associate real estate brokers, with the consent of a specified licensed real estate broker, to form a specified business entity; authorizing payment of compensation for the provision of real estate brokerage services to a specified business entity under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 38
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM