Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Facilities - Officers and Inspection Standards
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange (Chair, Special Joint Commission on Public Safety and Security in State and Local Correctional Facilities)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the appointing authority of a State correctional facility to impose on a correctional officer an emergency suspension of correctional powers without pay if the correctional officer is charged with a contraband violation; providing that a correctional officer who receives an emergency suspension without pay after being charged with a misdemeanor and who is not convicted of the violation shall have the emergency suspension rescinded and any lost time, compensation, status, and benefits restored, subject to a specified exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0176
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558476/1
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558476/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {973723/1
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {973723/1 Rejected (23-23)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {234862/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {558476/1 33
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {558476/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {973723/1 34
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 34
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {973723/1 Rejected (23-23) 35
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 First Reading Appropriations 40
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2014 3/20/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {234862/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-415, 9-416, 9-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM