Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Dyson and Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Natural Resources Police Force employ at least 435 Natural Resources police officers by fiscal year 2023; authorizing under specified circumstances, beginning in fiscal year 2015 and continuing each subsequent year, the Natural Resources Police Force to increase the number of cadets and recruits enrolling in the Maryland Natural Resources Police Academy until a specified goal is met; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0215
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0318 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM