Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding to the Baltimore Metropolitan Council a member who is appointed by the Board of County Commissioners of Queen Anne's County; providing that the new member serves at the pleasure of the Board; and providing that a Delegate or Senator who represents a district located in Queen Anne's County may be appointed as a member of the Council.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0173
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 16
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 16
Text - Third - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Senate 2/06/2017 2/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 17A
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 20
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 68
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Text - Chapter - Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM