Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 1/27/2021 11:14:12 AM
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Senate
Judicial Proceedings Committee
Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 11:00 AM
(Previous Date/Time: February 11, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0383
Sen Cassilly

Court Order to Use a Cell Site Simulator or Obtain Location Information From an Electronic Device - Procedures
SB0385
Sen Cassilly

Organized Retail Theft
SB0395
Sen Carter

Criminal Law - Felony Murder - Limitation and Review of Convictions for Children
SB0400
Sen Carter

Hate Crimes - False Statement to a Law Enforcement Officer
SB0406
Sen Augustine

Public Safety - Local Youth Violence Review Committees
SB0420
Sen Carter

Criminal Law – Drug Paraphernalia for Administration – Decriminalization
SB0440
Sen Lee

Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
SB0443
Sen West

Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Historically Significant Monument (Monument Protection Act of 2021)
SB0456
Sen Sydnor

Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
SB0471
Sen Washington (By Request)

Task Force to Study Crime Classification and Penalties - Alterations
SB0479
Sen Smith

Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
SB0505
Sen Hettleman

Criminal Law - First-Degree Child Abuse - Continuing Course of Conduct

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 16, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0519
Sen Klausmeier

Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0527
Sen Lee, et al

Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0531
Sen Kelley, et al

Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Imposition
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0553
Sen Young

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0559
Sen Ready

Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0561
Sens Hershey and Eckardt

Electric Cooperatives - Meetings - Alterations
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0569
The Pres (Admin)

Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING UPDATED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 17, 2021 1:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 17, 2021 11:00 AM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0494
Sen West, et al

Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
SB0497
Sen Kelley, et al

Juvenile Services Education Board and Program – Establishment, Powers, and Duties
SB0515
Sen Klausmeier

Criminal Procedure – Registered Sex Offenders – Entry Onto School Property
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0555
Sen Young

Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
ADDED: 10:06 AM
SB0560
Sen Ready, et al

Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
ADDED: 10:06 AM

Change made: January 27, 2021 10:06 AM - HEARING ADDED
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
February 18, 2021 11:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0524
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc)

Environment - Multidefendant Oil and Hazardous Substance Pollution Cases - Effect of Settlement
SB0530
The Pres (Atty Gen Ofc), et al

Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
SB0535
Sen King

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements

Other
Baltimore County
Change made: January 27, 2021 7:27 AM - HEARING ADDED
Baltimore County - Other
January 29, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: Senator Chris Van Hollen
Bill Hearings: HB181, HB249

Click to return on the top page