Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Morgan State University - Board of Regents
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Benson, Currie, Dyson, Jones-Rodwell, Kasemeyer, Kelley, McFadden, Muse, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the composition of the Board of Regents of Morgan State University; altering the length of time of the term of office of specified members of the Board; setting a limit on the number of terms that specified members may serve; and limiting the number of specified members who may be residents of other states.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0238
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584533/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294262/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senators Dyson, Reilly, and Conway
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {584533/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Appropriations 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {294262/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senators Dyson, Reilly, and Conway 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM