Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a specified petition for expungement of specified juvenile records; requiring the court to serve a specified petition on a specified State's Attorney; authorizing the court to order the expungement of a specified record under specified circumstances; requiring the court to consider specified criteria in its consideration of a specified petition for expungement of records; authorizing and requiring the court to deny a specified petition for expungement under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM