Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Judicial Conference, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 (SB0264/CH0036)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0229)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0282)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129)
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 /CH0036 (HB0277)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278)
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0129 (SB0262/CH0035) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0277 (SB0264/CH0036) Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0278 (SB0265/CH0037) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child By Request - Other 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0282 (SB0229) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0229 (HB0282) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0262 /CH0035 (HB0129) Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 /CH0036 (HB0277) Children in Need of Assistance - Review Hearings By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0037 (HB0278) Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM