Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Applicability
Sponsored by
Senators Stone, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Frosh, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Young, and Jones-Rodwell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the percentage of State money that must be used in an elementary or a secondary school construction project before the Prevailing Wage Law applies by altering specified definitions; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957072/3
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957072/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {533126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {823121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {957072/3 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 45
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {957072/3 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jones-Rodwell) {533126/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {823121/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 47
House 3/19/2014 3/16/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM