Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Eckardt, and Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a driver of a vehicle on a highway use the vehicle's tail lamps when the driver continuously operates the vehicle's windshield wipers due to impaired visibility resulting from unfavorable atmospheric conditions; and repealing the authority of a driver to use a vehicle's fog lights instead of the vehicle's headlamps during the continuous operation of the vehicle's windshield wipers under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM