Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Cassilly, Raskin, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Ramirez, and Ready
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, in a prosecution for a specified sexual offense, evidence that the defendant committed specified sexually assaultive behavior may be admissible for specified reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce specified evidence at least 90 days before trial; authorizing the court to admit evidence of sexually assaultive behavior if the court finds that the evidence is being offered to prove lack of consent or rebut a specified allegation that a minor victim fabricated the sexual offense; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {578679/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM