Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment and Removal
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a notary public applicant receive specified approval from a specified State Senator; requiring a notary public applicant to receive specified approval from the Secretary of State; authorizing the removal or suspension of a notary public from office based on a request made to the Governor from the Secretary of State instead of from a specified State Senator; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-102, 18-103, 18-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM