Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 1/19/2021 2:26:32 PM
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
Senate
Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: January 19, 2021 12:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital Department of Veterans Affairs
REMOVED: 12:22 PM

Change made: January 19, 2021 12:07 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 2, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital Department of Transportation
ADDED: 12:07 PM

Change made: January 19, 2021 12:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital University of Baltimore
REMOVED: 12:22 PM
Capital Salisbury University
REMOVED: 12:22 PM
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
REMOVED: 12:22 PM

Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Change made: January 19, 2021 12:36 PM - HEARING ADDED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
February 2, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Change made: January 19, 2021 12:36 PM - HEARING UPDATED
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
February 2, 2021 2:00 PM
(Previous Date/Time: February 2, 2021 1:00 PM)
Zoom / YouTube
SB0284
Sen Simonaire

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
SB0338
Sen Simonaire

Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
SB0353
Chr EHE (Dept)

Veterans – Benefits and Benefits Appeals Services – Disclosure Requirements
SJ0003
Sen Reilly

Commission to Establish a Maryland Women Veterans Memorial
SB0049
Sen Lee

State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
ADDED: 12:36 PM
SB0069
Sens Hester and Simonaire

Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations Office - Establishment
ADDED: 12:36 PM
SB0072
Sen Kagan

Open Meetings Act - Requirements for State Agencies and Local Boards of Elections (Maryland Transparency Act of 2021)
ADDED: 12:36 PM
SB0404
Sen Augustine

State Government – Websites – Required Information
ADDED: 12:36 PM

Finance Committee
Change made: January 19, 2021 9:07 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
February 11, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
SB0357
Sen Rosapepe

Joint Committee on Workforce Development
ADDED: 9:07 AM
SB0378
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
ADDED: 9:07 AM
SB0384
Sen Kelley

Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Compliance With State Labor Laws
ADDED: 9:07 AM
SB0410
Sen Kramer

Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Law Authorization
ADDED: 9:07 AM

House
Appropriations Committee
Change made: January 19, 2021 12:57 PM - HEARING ADDED
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
February 3, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0013
Del Luedtke

Influence on Collective Bargaining – Prohibition on Use of Public Funds and Income Tax Addition Modification
HB0046
Del Griffith

Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
HB0047
Del Ivey

Public Institutions of Higher Education – Contracts – Prohibition
HB0091
Del C. Jackson

Public Safety – Police Athletic League Grant Fund – Establishment
HB0114
Del Lierman, et al

Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
HB0216
Del Valentino-Smith

Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
HB0456
Del Jacobs

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
HB0460
Del Solomon

Transfer With Success Act
HB0479
Del Barve

State Retirement and Pension System - Investment Management Fees
HB0486
Del Solomon

State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Applicability, Bargaining Processes, and Memorandums of Understanding
HB0520
Del Barve

State Buildings – Geothermal Energy Systems – Requirement
HB0002
Del Korman

Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
ADDED: 12:57 PM

Capital Budget Subcommittee
Change made: January 19, 2021 12:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
February 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital Department of Veterans Affairs
REMOVED: 12:22 PM

Change made: January 19, 2021 12:07 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 2, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital Department of Transportation
ADDED: 12:07 PM

Change made: January 19, 2021 12:22 PM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
March 9, 2021 3:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Capital University of Baltimore
REMOVED: 12:22 PM
Capital Salisbury University
REMOVED: 12:22 PM
Capital University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science
REMOVED: 12:22 PM

Economic Matters Committee
Change made: January 19, 2021 9:49 AM - ITEM(S) ADDED/REMOVED
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
January 21, 2021 1:30 PM
Zoom / YouTube
HB0020
Del Wells

Maryland Stadium Authority – Applicability of Prevailing Wage
REMOVED: 9:49 AM

Other
Harford
Change made: January 19, 2021 9:51 AM - HEARING ADDED
Harford - Other
January 28, 2021 9:00 AM
Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Harford County Delegation Meeting