Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Updating and altering certain obsolete provisions relating to the reemployment of certain teachers and principals who are retirees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {859234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Senate 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Favorable with Amendments {859234/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Obsolete Reemployment Provisions
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 33
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Referred Appropriations 34
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM