Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bates, Cassilly, Hough, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for retired individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0299 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income (Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act)
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:43 PM