Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Update Report

As of: 10/23/2020 6:21:44 PM
Friday, October 23, 2020
Friday, October 23, 2020
Other
Legislative Policy Committee
Change made: October 23, 2020 2:01 PM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Policy Committee - Other
October 28, 2020 4:00 PM
Zoom Meeting
Governor's proposal to transfer a total of $250 million from the Revenue Stabilization Account to various agencies to address COVID-19 related impacts to businesses.

Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority
Change made: October 23, 2020 11:26 AM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority - Other
October 29, 2020 1:00 PM
Conference Call
PIN: 865 136 975#
Conference Call In Number: (US)+1-316-536-0499
Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority Meeting to discuss UMCP and UMES.

Maryland Insurance Administration
Change made: October 23, 2020 12:58 PM - HEARING ADDED
Maryland Insurance Administration - Other
November 18, 2020 12:00 PM to November 18, 2020 3:00 PM
On-Line Meeting
Public hearing on specific rate increase requests from certain long-term care insurance carriers in Maryland: MedAmerica Insurance Company and Genworth Life Insurance.
The hearing is for the insurance company officials to explain their reasons for rate increases.