Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax of up to $3,000 for certain expenses paid by a taxpayer during the taxable year for certain qualified pets; requiring the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet Expenses
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page