Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement and Shielding
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Smith, Washington, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the filing of a certain petition for expungement based on an acquittal, a dismissal, or a nolle prosequi within 3 years after the disposition unless the petitioner files with the petition a certain waiver or release; requiring that certain records that are ordered for expungement be removed to a separate secure area to which persons who do not have a legitimate reason for access are denied access; providing that certain expunged records are subject to discovery, except under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {558872/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Expungement and Shielding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {558872/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure – Expungement and Shielding
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-110, 10-303.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM