Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman (Chair, Workgroup to Study the Laws and Policies Related to the Distribution of Money to Volunteer and Career Companies) and Senators Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, Dyson, Edwards, Feldman, Getty, Hershey, Jacobs, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Reilly, Robey, Rosapepe, Shank, Simonaire, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Senator William H. Amoss Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Fund to be used to acquire land for a specified purpose; authorizing funds to be used to install specified systems and to acquire telecommunication devices, computers, equipment, and machinery under specified circumstances; providing that funds be distributed to volunteer companies based on need; requiring a county to distribute money to volunteer companies located in qualified municipalities; defining terms; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659235/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {659235/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101, 8-102, 8-103, 8-104, 8-105, 8-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM