Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Montgomery County - Sandy Spring Museum
Sponsored by
Senator Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend to June 1, 2014, the deadline for the Board of Trustees of the Sandy Spring Museum, Inc. to present evidence of a specified matching fund and to encumber funds for a specified grant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0358
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
NOTE: Prior authorizations that were altered during the 2013 Session were amended into the Omnibus Bill (HB 1372). Individual prior authorizations were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended HB 1372 to alter prior authorizations.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2010, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM