Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Guzzone, and Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing from $3,000,000 to $6,000,000 the maximum amount that may be transferred, in the State budget or through a specified budget amendment process, to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund from funds that are distributed to Program Open Space; and requiring that, if more than $3,000,000 is transferred to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund under the Act, the amount exceeding $3,000,000 shall be provided from the State's share of funds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0267
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {329935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {329935/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 661
Text - Chapter - Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page