Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the provision of law prohibiting in Carroll County the issuance of a permit authorizing the operation of a gaming event after 1 a.m. on Sunday.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285363/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Favorable Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Second Reading Passed 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {285363/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
(   13-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page