Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Carroll County Senators

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 /CH0672 (HB0613/CH0671)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0257 (HB0573)
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0186 (HB0575/CH0185)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0668 (HB0572/CH0667)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 /CH0670 (HB0576/CH0669)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Required Information on Application
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 /CH0766 (HB1336)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class D Beer License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1337)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0256 /CH0672 (HB0613/CH0671) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer and Wine Licenses By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0257 (HB0573) Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal and Sororal Organizations By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0186 (HB0575/CH0185) Carroll County - Gaming Events - Repeal of Sunday Prohibition By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 /CH0668 (HB0572/CH0667) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BC Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0298 /CH0670 (HB0576/CH0669) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Required Information on Application By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds By Request - Committee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187) Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 /CH0766 (HB1336) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class D Beer License By Request - Committee 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 766
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1337) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License By Request - Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:14 PM