Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementing a Civil Right to Counsel in Maryland; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified public officials on or before October 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0129
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0280 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-33)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (99-33) 59
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM