Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Program
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Senators (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Pilot Program in Baltimore City provide for the exchange of used hypodermic needles and syringes for sterile hypodermic needles and syringes on a "one-for-one" basis; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0354
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2014
Legislative Date
1/20/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-6)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/20/2014 1/20/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-6) 20
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-802, 24-805 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM