Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Senators (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from intentionally causing physical injury to another if the person knows or has reason to know that the other is a specified Baltimore City special parking enforcement officer or special traffic enforcement officer engaged in the performance of the officer's official duties; and establishing penalties for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0312
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM