Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the proceedings for which a local department of social services is required to provide specified notice to preadoptive parents and foster parents of a child under specified circumstances and at which preadoptive parents and foster parents have the right to be heard; repealing a requirement that a local department of social services provide specified notice to specified relatives of a child and substituting a requirement that the local department provide specified notice to caregivers of a child; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0278
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Judiciary 48A
House 3/19/2013 3/19/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM