Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Background Investigation - Armored Car Company Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Brochin, Hershey, Jacobs, Klausmeier, and Shank
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of State Police to accept a background investigation performed on behalf of an armored car company in place of a criminal history records check performed by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0646 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {568478/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments {568478/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary 41
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM