Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Amusement Ride Safety Advisory Board, the Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board, the Apprenticeship and Training Council, and the Board of Boiler Rules in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2024 specified termination provisions; repealing the termination provision for the Division of Labor and Industry; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to request units of State and local governments to provide specified information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0296
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197774/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343699/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {197774/1 Report Adopted 25
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Senate 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 27
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 30
House 2/25/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {343699/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 38
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Passed Enrolled 42
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-315, 3-601, 9-101, 9-201, 9-202, 9-301 )
(   11-402, 2-107, 2-109, 3-1008, 3-103, 3-306.1, 3-608, 3-704, 3-706, 3-712, 3-801, 3-802, 3-914, 3-920, 5-306, 5-607 )
(   12-904, 12-919 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM